GA HB796 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Classic Center Authority for Clarke County, approved March 10, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 3799), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 2, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 5665), so as to change certain provisions relative to the purpose and powers of the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clarke County; Classic Center Authority; change certain provisions relative to the purpose and powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #700 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2022-04-18 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 604 | |
2022-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Hopper |