GA HB791 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Powder Springs, approved March 13, 1970 (Ga. L. 1970, p. 2760), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 4, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 3969), so as to update the boundaries of the city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Powder Springs, City of; update boundaries
Sponsors
Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Erick Allen [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] |
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #361 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 94 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Hopper |