GA HB790 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Office of State Administrative Hearings, so as to implement recommendations of the Court Reform Council to improve efficiencies and achieve best practices for the administration of justice; to provide administrative law judges with authority to issue final decisions; to provide for exceptions; to require agencies to forward a request for a hearing to the Office of State Administrative Hearings; to provide administrative law judges with the power to enforce subpoenas and sanction parties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; recommendations of the Court Reform Council; implement
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #829 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #689 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #555 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #689 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #555 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 454 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House Hopper |