GA HB783 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the Town of North High Shoals, approved March 24, 1933 (Ga. L. 1933, p. 1040), as amended, so as to extensively revise and restate the town charter; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the town; to provide for a governing authority of such town and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, vacancies, compensation, expenses, qualifications, prohibitions, conflicts of interest, and suspension and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for inquiries and investigations; to provide for submission under the Federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
North High Shoals, Town of; revise and restate town charter; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #396 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #320 - Local Calendar (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #320 - Local Calendar (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 298 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-25 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2009-03-25 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-23 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-20 | House First Readers |