GA HB782 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Chatham Area Transit Authority, approved March 28, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 5082), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5296), so as to abolish the current authority memberships; to provide for new board membership and staggered terms; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham County; Chatham Area Transit Authority; abolish current authority memberships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #350 (Y: 134 N: 16 NV: 23 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-23 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60586 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200913 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60586#18798 |