GA HB782 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-13-60 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to privacy and confidentiality, use of data, and security program for the prescription drug monitoring program data base, so as to revise provisions relating to permissible users with access to the data base; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; provisions relating to permissible users with access to prescription drug monitoring program data base; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #687 (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #688 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #532 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #688 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #532 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hopper |