GA HB781 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to county sales and use taxes, so as to provide for the comprehensive revision of the sales and use tax for educational purposes; to amend Code Section 20-2-165 of the O.C.G.A., relating to equalization grants for local school systems, so as to revise a definition relating to local tax revenues; to amend Code Section 50-6-32 of the O.C.G.A., relating to transparency in government, so as to conform a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; comprehensive revision of tax for educational purposes; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] |
Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hopper |