GA HB78 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to amend Chapter 5 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Georgia uniform securities, so as to clarify a defined term; to provide for rules adopted by the Secretary of State regarding notice filing of certain securities; to provide for the recovery of court costs in civil liability actions related to the sale of securities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commerce and trade; Georgia uniform securities; clarify a defined term; provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback