GA HB78 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to amend Chapter 5 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Georgia uniform securities, so as to clarify a defined term; to provide for rules adopted by the Secretary of State regarding notice filing of certain securities; to provide for the recovery of court costs in civil liability actions related to the sale of securities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commerce and trade; Georgia uniform securities; clarify a defined term; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/49739 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/163058 |