GA HB777 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to standards and requirements for construction, alteration, etc., of buildings and other structures, so as to direct the Department of Community Affairs to undertake a review of the 2021 edition of the International Building Code so as to consider amending the state minimum standard codes to allow tall mass timber construction types; to provide a date by which said review is to be completed; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Affairs, Department of; consider amending the state minimum standard codes to allow tall mass timber construction types; direct
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #644 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #465 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #465 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 387 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House Hopper |