GA HB777 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal Article 5 of Chapter 10 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Historic Chattahoochee Compact; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Historic Chattahoochee Compact; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #592 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #472 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #472 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-03-29 | Act 293 | |
2018-03-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hopper |