GA HB774 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property, so as to allow for vehicle immobilization devices or boots to be applied to trespassing vehicles on certain property; to provide for definitions; to provide for rules and standards of operation; to provide for booting fees; to provide for notice and sign requirements; to authorize the Department of Public Safety to regulate and control the immobilization and booting of trespassing vehicles; to provide for application fees; to provide for the issuance of vehicle immobilization permits and renewal permits; to provide for preemption of local regulation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; vehicle immobilization devices to be applied to trespassing vehicles on certain property; provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-31HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback