GA HB772 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the State Court of Bacon County; to identify the authorized uses of such technology fee; to provide for the termination of such technology fee and dedication of residual funds to technology needs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bacon County; State Court; authorize assessment and collection of technology fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #338 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2023-05-01
2023-05-01 Act 213
2023-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-20HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback