GA HB769 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a board of elections for Spalding County, approved March 19, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4432), as amended, particularly by an Act approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4311), so as to revise the composition of the board; to provide for the termination of the term of the present fifth member; to provide for the appointment of a new fifth member; to provide for terms of office; to provide for the duties and requirements of the board; to provide for an elections supervisor and employees; to provide for qualifications and limitations on the election supervisor and employees; to provide for the county attorney to serve as legal adviser and represent the board; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spalding County; board of elections; revise composition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #263 (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13 Effective Date
2021-04-13 Act 15
2021-04-13HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-03-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-16HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback