GA HB766 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize Catoosa County, Georgia, to exercise all redevelopment and other powers under Article IX, Section II, Paragraph VII(b) of the Georgia Constitution and Chapter 44 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., the "Redevelopment Powers Law," as amended; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Catoosa County; Redevelopment Powers Law; provide for a referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #361 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #285 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #285 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 109 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-17 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House Hopper |