GA HB766 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions for property tax exemptions and deferral, so as to revise a definition to include any spouse; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property tax exemptions; definition to include any spouse; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Taylor Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-09 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House Hopper |