GA HB764 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Third Read Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Third Read Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles, so as to require drivers of motor vehicles to stop at crosswalks with pedestrian-activated rectangular rapid flash beacons; to make it unlawful to activate such devices when there is no intent to cross a roadway; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; drivers to stop at crosswalks with pedestrian-activated rectangular rapid flash beacons; require
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #766 (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #767 (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #537 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #767 (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #537 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read Lost |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hopper |