GA HB761 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-3-33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to transfer of vehicle to or from a dealer, records to be kept by dealers, and electronic filing, so as to provide for the filing of certificates of title by dealers; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; filing of certificates of title by dealers; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #841 (Y: 164 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #707 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #568 (Y: 160 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 546
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback