GA HB76 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 10A of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to licensing provisions regarding professional counselors, social workers, and marriage and family therapists, so as to revise provisions relating to education, experience, and training requirements for licensure in marriage and family therapy; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; education, experience, and training requirements for licensure in marriage and family therapy; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] |
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #376 (Y: 128 N: 31 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #276 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #275 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #35 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #276 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #275 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #35 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 57 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-25 | House | House Hopper |