GA HB759 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective Date 2021-04-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective Date 2021-04-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the Town of Thunderbolt to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Thunderbolt, Town of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #361 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #263 (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #263 (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective Date 2021-04-21 | |
2021-04-21 | Act 26 | |
2021-04-21 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-15 | House | House Hopper |