GA HB757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for the determination of qualifying periods for special elections; to provide for voter registration deadlines for special primary runoffs and any other election or runoff held in conjunction with a special primary runoff; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; determination of qualifying periods for special elections; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-01-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-14 | House | House Hopper |