GA HB741 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for the Supreme Court of Georgia, so as to change provisions relating to the terms of court; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Supreme Court; terms of court; change provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House Hopper |