GA HB739 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 1 of Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employment of certificated professional personnel in elementary and secondary education, so as to give a short title to a Code section relating to qualification for certain certificates for military spouses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tracy Rainey Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Vote #484 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 426
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-06HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback