GA HB738 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county law libraries, so as to revise the uses of excess funds by a county law library; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; county law libraries; revise uses of excess funds
Sponsors
Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Pam Dickerson [D] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #534 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #534 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House Hopper |