GA HB730 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create and establish the Whitfield County Public Facilities Authority; to provide for severability; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Whitfield County Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #236 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #254 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #254 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 79 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Hopper |