GA HB729 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to repeal certain provisions relating to state ad valorem tax; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; property; repeal certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #864 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #464 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #864 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #464 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 334 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-23 | House | House Hopper |