GA HB728 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to education and to revenue and taxation authorizing the Public Education Innovation Fund Foundation to receive private donations to be used for grants to public schools and providing for an income tax credit for qualified education donations, approved April 27, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 100), so as to repeal an uncodified sunset provision; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Education Innovation Fund Foundation; repeal an uncodified sunset provision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #469 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback