GA HB723 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a method of compensating the chairperson and members of the board of education of McIntosh County, approved March 14, 1980 (Ga. L. 1980, p. 3112), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 29, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 5231), and by an Act approved April 10, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 4442), so as to modify the compensation of the chairperson and members of the board of education of McIntosh County; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

McIntosh County; Board of Education; modify compensation of chairperson and members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #296 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #251 (Y: 165 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03 Effective Date 2023-05-03
2023-05-03 Act 300
2023-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-31HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-20HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-20HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-14HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback