GA HB719 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to powers of housing generally, so as to require housing authorities to develop and implement policies granting housing preferences to veterans who are homeless individuals; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Buildings and housing; housing authorities to develop and implement policies granting housing preferences to veterans who are homeless; require

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback