GA HB718 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 2 of Part 1 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to compulsory attendance, so as to excuse certain absences of students with parents in service of the armed forces of the United States, the Reserves, or the National Guard or veterans of same; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; certain absences of students with parents in service of the armed forces of the United States; excuse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #646 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #632 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 332
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback