GA HB718 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to inmate policies and penal institutions, so as to prohibit the use of restraints on pregnant inmates under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Penal institutions; restraints on pregnant inmates under certain circumstances; prohibit use
Sponsors
Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Mable Thomas [D] | Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-22 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-21 | House | House Hopper |
2015-12-16 | House | House Prefiled |