GA HB717 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-8-11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to operational rules for autonomous vehicles, so as to provide for the applicability of certain consumer protection laws to autonomous vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; applicability of certain consumer protection laws to autonomous vehicles; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #737 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #524 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 331
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-20HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-20HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-22HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback