GA HB716 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reincorporate the City of Cave Spring, approved April 28, 1969 (Ga. L. 1969, p. 3872), as amended, so as to revise and modernize the charter of such city; to abolish the office of mayor; to create the office of city manager; to provide for powers and duties of the city council and the city manager; to provide for related matters; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cave Spring, City of; revise and modernize charter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #296 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #263 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2023-05-01
2023-05-01 Act 193
2023-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-31HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-14HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback