GA HB715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding specific, business, and occupation taxes, so as to eliminate gross receipts as a criterion for classifying businesses and practitioners for purposes of calculating the occupation tax levied by local governments; to remove inapplicable references; to require that the proceeds of local government regulatory fees be used to pay for regulatory activity and not general operations; to remove provisions authorizing calculation of regulatory fees for new construction, renovation, and other construction projects; to remove provisions authorizing alternative occupation tax rates for practitioners of certain professions and occupations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; gross receipts as a criterion for classifying businesses and practitioners for purposes of calculating the occupation tax levied by local governments; eliminate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-25 | House | House Postponed |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-04-02 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56470 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/186815 |