GA HB714 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 11 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to provisional and final remedies and special proceedings, so as to revise and provide for new requirements under the Georgia Civil Practice Act for settlement offers and arrangements for tort claims for personal injury, bodily injury, and death; to amend Chapter 7 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to kinds of insurance, limits of risks, and reinsurance, so as to revise the liability of an insurer upon refusal to pay an insured for any loss pursuant to uninsured motorist coverage under motor vehicle liability policies; to revise a penalty; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Civil Practice Act; revise and provide for new requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #402 (Y: 116 N: 46 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #300 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #244 (Y: 137 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #300 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #244 (Y: 137 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 203 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Hopper |