GA HB713 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Polk County and provide for its powers and duties, approved March 30, 1989 (Ga. L. 1989, p. 4652), so as to expand the board from three to five members; to provide for the appointment and terms of board members; to provide for the nomination of certain board members; to update provisions relating to filling vacancies on the board; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Polk County; board of elections and registration; expand board to five members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #296 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Hbs 710, 713, 730, 736: House Vote #252 (Y: 101 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03 Effective Date 2023-05-03
2023-05-03 Act 297
2023-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-31HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-20HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-14HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback