GA HB712 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Department of Administrative Services, so as to define certain terms; to create the Division of Supplier Diversity; to provide for appointment of a director; to provide for powers and duties of the director; to create the position of minority and women owned business enterprises state-wide advocate; to provide for appointment; to provide for duties; to provide for provisions for state contracts; to provide for a state-wide disparity study; to provide for contents; to provide for the structure of procurement contracts; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for the implementation of rules and regulations; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Administrative Services, Department of; create Division of Supplier Diversity; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Pedro Marin [D] | Rep. Winfred Dukes [D] |
Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] | Rep. Gloria Frazier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-22 | House | House Hopper |
2015-12-04 | House | House Prefiled |