GA HB704 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations of actions on recovery for deficiencies connected with improvements to realty and resulting injuries, so as to change when the statute of limitations shall accrue for certain actions arising from the burial of construction waste or materials; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil practice; burial of construction waste or materials; change when statute of limitations shall accrue for certain actions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-19HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback