GA HB701 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-164 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local five mill share funds, so as to exclude freeport property from the equalized adjusted school property tax digest for purposes of calculating local five mill share; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; equalized adjusted school property tax digest for purposes of calculating local five mill share; exclude freeport property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-04-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56363 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/186393 |