GA HB70 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 29 of the O.C.G.A., relating to guardian and ward, so as to revise provisions relating to guardians and conservators of minors and adults; to amend various provisions of the O.C.G.A., so as to make conforming revisions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guardian and ward; guardian and conservators of minors and adults; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #405 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #407 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #71 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #407 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #71 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 233 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-12 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |