GA HB7 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to provide for in-state tuition at units of the University System of Georgia and branches of the Technical College System of Georgia for youth who are from foster care or homeless situations; to exclude foster care assistance from consideration as income for purposes of calculating financial aid; to provide for definitions; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Higher Education Access and Success for Homeless and Foster Youth Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Samuel Park [D] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
Rep. Sheila Nelson [D] | Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |