GA HB7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to provide requirements for safety plans in early care and education programs; to provide a short title; to revise the requirements for school safety plans at public elementary and secondary schools; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Child Safety and Emergency Preparedness Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Darrel Ealum [D] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] |
Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |
2014-11-19 | House | House Prefiled |