GA HB696 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from state sales and use taxes, so as to create an exemption for certain computer equipment sold or leased to certain entities for use in high-technology data centers; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; certain computer equipment sold or leased to certain entities for use in high-technology data centers; create exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #824 (Y: 108 N: 54 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #683 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #610 (Y: 82 N: 85 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #611 (Y: 134 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #622 (Y: 120 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 421
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-23SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Reconsidered
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-19HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/696
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/171186.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174855.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175164.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175300.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176996.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178913.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15855
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15844
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15843
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16151
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16272

Bill Comments

feedback