GA HB693 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to solid waste management generally, so as to repeal provisions relating to authorization to enforce collection of taxes, fees, or assessments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid waste management; authorization to enforce collection of taxes, fees, or assessments; repeal provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #525 (Y: 98 N: 64 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52051 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171150 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52051#15700 |