GA HB692 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to deferred compensation plans, so as to provide that the governing authority of a municipality may pay costs or fees associated with an employee's participation in a deferred compensation plan; to provide that certain public employees may be automatically enrolled in deferred compensation plans; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Deferred compensation plans; governing authority of a municipality may pay costs or fees associated with an employee's participation in a plan; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] |
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #465 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hopper |