GA HB690 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the Town of Roopville in the County of Carroll, approved October 7, 1885 (Ga. L. 1884-5, p. 391), as amended, so as to repeal certain provisions relating to the sale of liquors within the corporate limits of said town; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Roopville, Town of; sale of liquors; repeal certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #342 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #205 - Local Calendar (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #205 - Local Calendar (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-06 | Act 192 | |
2009-05-06 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House First Readers |