GA HB686 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making and providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2018, known as the "General Appropriations Act," Act No. 37, approved May 1, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, Volume One, Appendix, commencing at page 1 of 249), to make, provide, and change certain appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2017 - June 30, 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback