GA HB684 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2018, and ending June 30, 2019; to make and provide such appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2018 - June 30, 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #805 (Y: 175 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #712 (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #713 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #666 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Vote #688 (Y: 155 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02 Effective Date
2018-05-02 Act 301
2018-05-02HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 49th, 46th, 4th
2018-03-23HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 116th, 159th, 47th
2018-03-23HouseHouse Insisted
2018-03-23SenateSenate Insisted
2018-03-23HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-23SenateSenate Transmitted House
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-03-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback