GA HB684 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to dental hygienists, so as to provide for delegable services and procedures that may be performed by dental hygienists; to revise provisions regarding direct supervision of dental hygienists by dentists in certain settings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dental hygienists; delegable services and procedures that may be performed by hygienists; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-26 | House | House Hopper |