GA HB683 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making and providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2018, known as the "General Appropriations Act," Act No. 37, approved May 1, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, Volume One, Appendix, commencing at page 1 of 249), to make, provide, and change certain appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2017 - June 30, 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #581 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #672 (Y: 155 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #462 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #466 (Y: 167 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Effective Date
2018-03-09 Act 286
2018-03-09HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-03-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-05SenateSenate Transmitted House
2018-03-05SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-01HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-01HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-02-15SenateSenate Transmitted House
2018-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-15SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-01-31HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback